NY A08823 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing incapacity to consent when a person is under arrest, detention or otherwise in actual custody.
Title
Relates to establishing incapacity to consent when a person is under arrest, detention or otherwise in actual custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.629 |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | print number 8823a |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07708 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES