NY A08807 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 8807a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 8807a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town board of the town of Queensbury, in the county of Warren, to diminish the area of the Glen Lake aquatic plant growth control district by removing certain parcels of land therefrom that are not benefited by such district.
Title
Authorizes the town board of the town of Queensbury, in the county of Warren, to diminish the area of the Glen Lake aquatic plant growth control district by removing certain parcels of land therefrom that are not benefited by such district.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | print number 8807a |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-11-29 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06941 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to local governments