NY A08783 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - substituted by s7697
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - substituted by s7697
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides menstrual products at no cost to menstruating individuals in temporary shelters, including, but not limited to, sanitary napkins, tampons and panty liners.
Title
Provides menstrual products at no cost to menstruating individuals in temporary shelters, including, but not limited to, sanitary napkins, tampons and panty liners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Assembly | substituted by s7697 |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.339 |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S07697 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.72