NY A08769 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - print number 8769a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - print number 8769a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the eligibility of New York city transit authority employees for performance of duty disability retirement.
Title
Relates to the eligibility of New York city transit authority employees for performance of duty disability retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | print number 8769a |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-11-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09027 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES