NY A08760 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - substituted by s7782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - substituted by s7782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services and the division of housing and community renewal to conduct a study examining any increasing costs of liability, fire and casualty insurance premiums or any lack of availability of liability, fire and casualty insurance coverage for affordable housing.
Title
Directs the department of financial services and the division of housing and community renewal to conduct a study examining any increasing costs of liability, fire and casualty insurance premiums or any lack of availability of liability, fire and casualty insurance coverage for affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Assembly | substituted by s7782 |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.445 |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07782 (Same As) 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.158