NY A08729 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax exemption for improvements to the property of severely injured members of the armed forces of the United States; authorizes localities to adopt a local law or resolution granting an exemption from taxation and special ad valorem levies for real property altered or improved for the purposes of removing architectural barriers that challenge the mobility of a severely injured member of the armed forces of the United States.
Title
Establishes a tax exemption for improvements to the property of severely injured members of the armed forces of the United States; authorizes localities to adopt a local law or resolution granting an exemption from taxation and special ad valorem levies for real property altered or improved for the purposes of removing architectural barriers that challenge the mobility of a severely injured member of the armed forces of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.447 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.447 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | print number 8729a |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2017-10-20 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07001 (Same As) 2018-06-01 - PRINT NUMBER 7001A