NY A08715 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - substituted by s7738
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - substituted by s7738
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the coroner, coroner's physician or medical examiner shall report to the division of veterans' services, in a form and time frame developed by the department of health, any death which appears to be a suicide by a person who, to the knowledge of the coroner, coroner's physician or medical examiner, is a veteran; defines veteran.
Title
Provides that the coroner, coroner's physician or medical examiner shall report to the division of veterans' services, in a form and time frame developed by the department of health, any death which appears to be a suicide by a person who, to the knowledge of the coroner, coroner's physician or medical examiner, is a veteran; defines veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Assembly | substituted by s7738 |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.318 |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07738 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.95