NY A08622 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-5)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - amend by restoring to original print 8622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - amend by restoring to original print 8622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would require the office of children and family services to establish an educational outreach program to promote the awareness of the potential long-term harm to adolescents' privacy that may arise from text messaging, emailing or posting on the internet images and photographs of themselves that are provocative in nature. Also, to provide an affirmative defense to young persons for certain acts with regard to the possessions and dissemination of such images and photographs of themselves.
Title
Relates to educating children on the harms of electronically sending and posting certain images of themselves.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | amend by restoring to original print 8622 | |
2010-06-16 | print number 8622a | |
2010-06-16 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-03-09 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to codes | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-29 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S5680 (Same As) 2010-06-22 - referred to ways and means