NY A08619 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - advanced to third reading cal.384
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - advanced to third reading cal.384
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to allowing pharmacists to direct limited service laboratories and order and administer COVID-19 and influenza tests and modernizing nurse practitioners and authorizing pharmacists to perform collaborative drug therapy management with physicians in certain settings.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to allowing pharmacists to direct limited service laboratories and order and administer COVID-19 and influenza tests and modernizing nurse practitioners and authorizing pharmacists to perform collaborative drug therapy management with physicians in certain settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.384 |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-22 | Assembly | print number 8619b |
2024-03-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | print number 8619a |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2024-01-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07872 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7872A