NY A08583 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hearings following major power outages.
Title
Relates to hearings following major power outages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.542 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.922 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6373 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.703 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | reference changed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06373 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8583