NY A08557 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - advanced to third reading cal.356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - advanced to third reading cal.356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that seat belts be available and used on charter buses for persons age 8 through 16.
Title
Requires that seat belts be available and used on charter buses for persons age 8 through 16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.356 |
2024-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08610 (Same As) 2024-02-21 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION