NY A08557 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the operation of traffic-control signal photo violation-monitoring devices.
Title
Relates to the operation of traffic-control signal photo violation-monitoring devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00491 (Same As) 2017-01-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
S07088 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
S07088 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION