NY A08542 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits utility corporations from charging customers for gas or electric service which was rendered more than three months of the monthly billing period; requires utility corporations to provide a thirteen-month usage history in their bills.
Title
Prohibits utility corporations from charging customers for gas or electric service which was rendered more than three months of the monthly billing period; requires utility corporations to provide a thirteen-month usage history in their bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8012 |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.251 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08012 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.62