NY S08012 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits utility corporations from charging customers for gas or electric service which was rendered more than three months of the monthly billing period; requires utility corporations to provide a thirteen-month usage history in their bills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits utility corporations from charging customers for gas or electric service which was rendered more than three months of the monthly billing period; requires utility corporations to provide a thirteen-month usage history in their bills.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-07SenateSIGNED CHAP.62
2024-02-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2024-01-30Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-30Assemblypassed assembly
2024-01-23Assemblyordered to third reading cal.251
2024-01-23Assemblysubstituted for a8542
2024-01-17Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2024-01-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.21
2024-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08542 (Same As) 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8012

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback