NY A08540 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - substituted by s8096
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - substituted by s8096
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of a chapter of the laws of 2023 relating to the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives; provides such provisions will take effect January 1, 2024.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of a chapter of the laws of 2023 relating to the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives; provides such provisions will take effect January 1, 2024.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Assembly | substituted by s8096 |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.303 |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08096 (Same As) 2024-02-13 - SIGNED CHAP.90