NY A08537 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - signed chap.571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - signed chap.571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing coverage and information on chest wall reconstruction surgery after a mastectomy or partial mastectomy; provides that aesthetic flat closure be included in information provided to patients and in insurance coverage.
Title
Relates to providing coverage and information on chest wall reconstruction surgery after a mastectomy or partial mastectomy; provides that aesthetic flat closure be included in information provided to patients and in insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Assembly | signed chap.571 |
2022-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1548 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7881 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.550 |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07881 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8537