NY A08534 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the tax on gaming revenues in region five of zone two; requires any money realized from the decrease in their slot machine tax rate to only be used by the facility to offer childcare for employees, food and beverage conversion, any other project or use that improves the economic infrastructure of the facility, or for rehiring laid off workers, hiring new workers or retaining current workers at the facility.
Title
Relates to the tax on gaming revenues in region five of zone two; requires any money realized from the decrease in their slot machine tax rate to only be used by the facility to offer childcare for employees, food and beverage conversion, any other project or use that improves the economic infrastructure of the facility, or for rehiring laid off workers, hiring new workers or retaining current workers at the facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8086 |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.9 |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.9 |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-05 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S08086 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - SIGNED CHAP.19