NY A08534 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the village of Spencerport, town of Ogden, county of Monroe, as the "Firefighter Robert Fowler Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the village of Spencerport, town of Ogden, county of Monroe, as the "Firefighter Robert Fowler Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Asm. Josh Jensen [R] | Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Assembly | signed chap.400 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1551 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8056 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.325 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.325 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08056 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8534