NY A08534 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - print number 8534a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - print number 8534a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes shared purchasing contracts for political subdivisions to purchase apparatus, supplies, materials or equipment.
Title
Authorizes shared purchasing contracts for political subdivisions to purchase apparatus, supplies, materials or equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Assembly | print number 8534a |
2012-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-07-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00624 (Same As) 2012-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 624A