NY A08516 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - print number 8516a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - print number 8516a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Stephen Ferraro and Stephen Porcello to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible list for appointment as full-time police officers for the village of St. Johnsville, county of Montgomery.
Title
Authorizes Stephen Ferraro and Stephen Porcello to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible list for appointment as full-time police officers for the village of St. Johnsville, county of Montgomery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-17 | Assembly | print number 8516a |
2020-08-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07203 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to governmental employees