NY A08515 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to extend the power of impeachment and trial of impeachment to any former office holder for impeachable conduct committed while such person was in office; provides for disqualification of such person from holding public office in the future.
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to extend the power of impeachment and trial of impeachment to any former office holder for impeachable conduct committed while such person was in office; provides for disqualification of such person from holding public office in the future.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-12-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07336 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY