NY A08511 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - substituted by s8072
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - substituted by s8072
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the scope of the work an athletic trainer is authorized to perform.
Title
Relates to the scope of the work an athletic trainer is authorized to perform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Assembly | substituted by s8072 |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.301 |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08072 (Same As) 2024-03-01 - SIGNED CHAP.104