NY A08506 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - substituted by s8011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - substituted by s8011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the legal regulated rent for the combination of two or more vacant apartments; relates to exemptions from rent stabilization on the basis of substantial rehabilitation; relates to clearly defining the scope of the fraud exception to the pre-HSTPA four-year rule for calculating rents and relates to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Establishes the legal regulated rent for the combination of two or more vacant apartments; relates to exemptions from rent stabilization on the basis of substantial rehabilitation; relates to clearly defining the scope of the fraud exception to the pre-HSTPA four-year rule for calculating rents and relates to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Assembly | substituted by s8011 |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.276 |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S08011 (Same As) 2024-03-01 - SIGNED CHAP.95