NY A08504 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to trial discharges of youth in foster care and voluntary re-placements of older adolescents in foster care; extends trial discharges at permanency hearings for successive periods of up to six months until youth reach the age of 21, and where the affected youth is over 18, any such trail discharge would require his or her consent; allows youth between 18-21 who have been discharged within 24 months to seek leave to return voluntarily to foster care.
Title
Relates to trial discharges of youth in foster care and voluntary re-placements of older adolescents in foster care; extends trial discharges at permanency hearings for successive periods of up to six months until youth reach the age of 21, and where the affected youth is over 18, any such trail discharge would require his or her consent; allows youth between 18-21 who have been discharged within 24 months to seek leave to return voluntarily to foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | signed chap.342 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-15 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-15 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-08 | 3RD READING CAL.710 | |
2010-06-08 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4388 | |
2010-03-10 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | |
2010-03-10 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-10 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.595 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-18 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-18 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-18 | ordered to third reading rules cal.477 | |
2009-06-18 | rules report cal.477 | |
2009-06-18 | reported | |
2009-06-17 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-03 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-05-26 | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S4388 (Same As) 2010-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8504