NY A08495 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of housing and community renewal to provide an annual report on the New York access to home programs.
Title
Requires the division of housing and community renewal to provide an annual report on the New York access to home programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | signed chap.2 |
2024-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-01-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.44 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8054 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.237 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S08054 (Same As) 2024-01-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8495