NY A08493 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - signed chap.177
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - signed chap.177
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the date that the final report from the stretch limousine passenger safety task force shall be issued to October 1, 2022.
Title
Extends the date that the final report from the stretch limousine passenger safety task force shall be issued to October 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Assembly | signed chap.177 |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-03-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.242 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7563 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.393 |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-12-08 | Assembly | print number 8493a |
2021-12-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07563 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8493A