NY A08479 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - signed chap.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - signed chap.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the time limitations to commence certain actions.
Title
Extends the time limitations to commence certain actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. Samuel Roberts [D] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] |
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.46 |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1225 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7760 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.5 |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.5 |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07760 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8479