NY A08469 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - substituted by s5827
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - substituted by s5827
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes retired supreme court justices to serve as justice of supreme court until age 80; provides that judges of the court of appeals need not retire until the end of the year in which they turn 80; prohibits the appointment of any person over age 70 to the court of appeals.
Title
Authorizes retired supreme court justices to serve as justice of supreme court until age 80; provides that judges of the court of appeals need not retire until the end of the year in which they turn 80; prohibits the appointment of any person over age 70 to the court of appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Assembly | substituted by s5827 |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.603 |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05827 (Same As) 2011-09-13 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE