NY A08445 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any person licensed as a physician, physician's assistant, massage therapist, physical therapist, chiropractor, dentist, optometrist, nurse, nurse practitioner or podiatrist in another state or territory and appointed by the World Triathlon Corporation to practice his or her profession in this state in connection with an athletic event sanctioned by such corporation.
Title
Authorizes any person licensed as a physician, physician's assistant, massage therapist, physical therapist, chiropractor, dentist, optometrist, nurse, nurse practitioner or podiatrist in another state or territory and appointed by the World Triathlon Corporation to practice his or her profession in this state in connection with an athletic event sanctioned by such corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s6323 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.159 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06323 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.71