NY A08439 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - substituted by s6165a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - substituted by s6165a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the repair of damaged pesticide containers, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the repair of damaged pesticide containers, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Assembly | substituted by s6165a |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.459 |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06165 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - SIGNED CHAP.10