NY A08432 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Declares a policy of equal treatment of people of all races, cultures, religions, incomes, education levels and sexual preference in the development and enforcement of environmental laws, regulations and policies.
Title
Declares a policy of equal treatment of people of all races, cultures, religions, incomes, education levels and sexual preference in the development and enforcement of environmental laws, regulations and policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to environmental conservation | |
2009-06-17 | print number 8432a | |
2009-06-17 | amend (t) and recommit to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-20 | referred to environmental conservation |