NY A08427 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-6)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "New York Buy American act"; provides that all contracts over one million dollars in value and made and awarded by any department or agency of the state for the construction, reconstruction, alteration, repair, maintenance or improvement of any roads or bridges shall contain a provision that the iron, steel and concrete used or supplied in the performance of the contract or any subcontract thereto and permanently incorporated into such road or bridge, shall be produced or made in whole or substantial part in the United States, its territories or possessions; enacts provisions relating to a working group between NYS and Canada.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "New York Buy American act"; provides that all contracts over one million dollars in value and made and awarded by any department or agency of the state for the construction, reconstruction, alteration, repair, maintenance or improvement of any roads or bridges shall contain a provision that the iron, steel and concrete used or supplied in the performance of the contract or any subcontract thereto and permanently incorporated into such road or bridge, shall be produced or made in whole or substantial part in the United States, its territories or possessions; enacts provisions relating to a working group between NYS and Canada.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.2179
2017-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6639A
2017-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.578
2017-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.578
2017-06-20Assemblyreported
2017-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-18Assemblyprint number 8427a
2017-06-18Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2017-06-18Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2017-06-15Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S06639 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8427A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08427&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08427&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08427
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08427&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08427A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08427&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08427&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8427#SF1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08427&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback