NY A08423 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - print number 8423a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - print number 8423a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a procedure for village incorporation in a suburban town.
Title
Provides a procedure for village incorporation in a suburban town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Assembly | print number 8423a |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06728 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT