NY A08421 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 95-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - signed chap.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 95-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - signed chap.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides increased protections for protected classes and special protections for employees who have been sexually harassed; prohibits nondisclosure agreements related to discrimination; prohibits mandatory arbitration clauses related to discrimination; requires employers to provide employees notice of their sexual harassment prevention training program in writing in English and in employees' primary languages; extends the statute of limitations for claims resulting from unlawful or discriminatory practices constituting sexual harassment to three years; requires review and update of the model sexual harassment prevention guidance document and sexual harassment prevention policy; and directs the commissioner of labor to conduct a study on strengthening sexual harassment prevention laws.
Title
Provides increased protections for protected classes and special protections for employees who have been sexually harassed; prohibits nondisclosure agreements related to discrimination; prohibits mandatory arbitration clauses related to discrimination; requires employers to provide employees notice of their sexual harassment prevention training program in writing in English and in employees' primary languages; extends the statute of limitations for claims resulting from unlawful or discriminatory practices constituting sexual harassment to three years; requires review and update of the model sexual harassment prevention guidance document and sexual harassment prevention policy; and directs the commissioner of labor to conduct a study on strengthening sexual harassment prevention laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-12 | Senate | signed chap.160 |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1663 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6577 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.580 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.580 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06577 (Same As) 2019-08-12 - signed chap.160