NY A08412 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the statutes of limitations for certain sex crimes.
Title
Extends the statutes of limitations for certain sex crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.315 |
2019-09-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.539 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a8412 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1660 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6574 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.539 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.539 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06574 (Same As) 2019-09-18 - SIGNED CHAP.315
S06546 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
A08376 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - referred to codes
S06546 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
A08376 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - referred to codes