NY A08401 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.407
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the establishment of a sexual assault victim bill of rights by the department of health, in consultation with the division of criminal justice services and the office of victim services; establishes a victim's right to notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the establishment of a sexual assault victim bill of rights by the department of health, in consultation with the division of criminal justice services and the office of victim services; establishes a victim's right to notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.407
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1985
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8977
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.164
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.164
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-08Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8401c
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-05-30Assemblyprint number 8401b
2018-05-30Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2018-01-30Assemblyprint number 8401a
2018-01-30Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to health
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06428 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S08977 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8401C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08401
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08401A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08401B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08401C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08401&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8401#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback