NY A08389 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the authority of an agent to act outside a hospital setting to make certain decisions regarding the transport of the principal to a particular medical setting when such principal is unconscious or unresponsive.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the authority of an agent to act outside a hospital setting to make certain decisions regarding the transport of the principal to a particular medical setting when such principal is unconscious or unresponsive.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-05Senatetabled
2012-10-03Senatevetoed memo.156
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1081
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5014A
2012-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.185
2012-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.185
2012-06-14Assemblyreported
2012-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-05-31Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to health
2011-06-15Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S05014 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8389

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback