NY A08386 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - print number 8386a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - print number 8386a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "faith-based affordable housing act" for development on residential land; defines terms; provides that each village, town, and city shall allow the construction and occupation of residential buildings on any covered site up to the specified densities; provides that all residential buildings constructed pursuant to this section in a town, village, or city with fewer than one million inhabitants shall set aside twenty percent of the residential floor area for households earning an average of eighty percent of area median income; outlines the densities for New York city; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "faith-based affordable housing act" for development on residential land; defines terms; provides that each village, town, and city shall allow the construction and occupation of residential buildings on any covered site up to the specified densities; provides that all residential buildings constructed pursuant to this section in a town, village, or city with fewer than one million inhabitants shall set aside twenty percent of the residential floor area for households earning an average of eighty percent of area median income; outlines the densities for New York city; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Assembly | print number 8386a |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2023-12-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07791 (Same As) 2024-05-01 - PRINT NUMBER 7791A