NY A08368 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on August 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes video camera recordings from cameras worn or used by police from being included as personnel records and provides for the release of such recordings pursuant to the freedom of information law.
Title
Excludes video camera recordings from cameras worn or used by police from being included as personnel records and provides for the release of such recordings pursuant to the freedom of information law.
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. Ron Kim [D] |
Asm. Erik Dilan [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.170 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.170 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | print number 8368b |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | print number 8368a |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06030 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CODES