NY A08367 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.588
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.588
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Comptroller Campaign Finance Reform Act" to provide for public financing for campaigns for the office of the state comptroller; authorizes the imposition of an additional surcharge on recoveries for fraudulent practices regarding stocks, bonds and other securities; establishes the New York State campaign finance fund; provides for a New York State campaign finance fund check-off.
Title
Enacts the "Comptroller Campaign Finance Reform Act" to provide for public financing for campaigns for the office of the state comptroller; authorizes the imposition of an additional surcharge on recoveries for fraudulent practices regarding stocks, bonds and other securities; establishes the New York State campaign finance fund; provides for a New York State campaign finance fund check-off.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.588 |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | print number 8367b |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-04-17 | Assembly | print number 8367a |
2012-04-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | committed to election law |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.292 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.509 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.509 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06512 (Same As) 2012-02-17 - REFERRED TO RULES