NY A08359 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-21)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board.

Sponsors

Asm. Keith Wright [D]Asm. Annie Rabbitt [R]Asm. Peter Rivera [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]
Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Margaret Markey [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Francisco Moya [D]
Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D]Asm. Alan Maisel [D]Asm. Eric Stevenson [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. William Scarborough [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Vito Lopez [D]Asm. Nelson Castro [D]
Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Matthew Titone [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Phillip Goldfeder [D]Asm. William Boyland [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Naomi Rivera [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Guillermo Linares [D]
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D]Asm. Hakeem Jeffries [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D]Asm. Micah Kellner [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Karim Camara [D]
Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Vanessa Gibson [D]Asm. Inez Barron [D]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Sen. Philip Boyle [R]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Nancy Calhoun [R]
Asm. Barbara Clark [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Brian Curran [R]
Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Rafael Espinal [D]Asm. Herman Farrell [D]
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Andrew Goodell [R]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]
Asm. Alfred Graf [R]Asm. Earlene Hooper [D]Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D]Asm. Steve Katz [R]
Sen. George Latimer [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Daniel Losquadro [R]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]
Asm. William Magee [D]Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. John McEneny [D]
Asm. Thomas McKevitt [R]Asm. Grace Meng [D]Asm. Joel Miller [R]Asm. Joan Millman [D]
Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Dean Murray [R]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Robert Reilly [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Addie Jenne [D]Sen. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Joseph Saladino [R]Asm. Michelle Schimel [D]
Asm. Michael Simanowitz [D]Asm. Robert Sweeney [D]Asm. Claudia Tenney [R]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Raymond Walter [R]Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D]

Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.541
2012-06-21Assemblyrules report cal.541
2012-06-21Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-19Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-06-17Assemblyprint number 8359b
2012-06-17Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2012-04-26Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-04-19Assemblyprint number 8359a
2012-04-19Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to labor
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to labor
2011-06-14Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S06291 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - REFERRED TO LABOR
S07026 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 7026A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback