NY S07026 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 7026A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 7026A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board.
Title
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automatic people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7026A |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08359 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - REFERRED TO RULES