NY A08345 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health to report to the legislature on the feasibility of entering into partnerships to increase competition, lower prices, and address shortages in the market for generic prescription drugs, to reduce the cost of prescription drugs for public and private purchasers, taxpayers, and consumers, and to increase patient access to affordable drugs; makes related provisions.
Title
Directs the department of health to report to the legislature on the feasibility of entering into partnerships to increase competition, lower prices, and address shortages in the market for generic prescription drugs, to reduce the cost of prescription drugs for public and private purchasers, taxpayers, and consumers, and to increase patient access to affordable drugs; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | print number 8345b |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | print number 8345a |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-12-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04786 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - referred to health