NY S04786 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York affordable drug manufacturing act" to direct the commissioner of health to enter into partnerships to increase competition, lower prices, and address shortages in the market for generic prescription drugs, to reduce the cost of prescription drugs for public and private purchasers, taxpayers, and consumers, and to increase patient access to affordable drugs.
Title
Enacts the "New York affordable drug manufacturing act" to direct the commissioner of health to enter into partnerships to increase competition, lower prices, and address shortages in the market for generic prescription drugs, to reduce the cost of prescription drugs for public and private purchasers, taxpayers, and consumers, and to increase patient access to affordable drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.80 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-12-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4786A |
2023-12-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2023-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08345 (Same As) 2024-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means