NY A08331 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.262
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.262
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to peace officer status of certain federal law enforcement officers; corrects certain provisions relating to the new titles of federal agencies and officers providing immigration, customs and border patrol duties.
Title
Relates to peace officer status of certain federal law enforcement officers; corrects certain provisions relating to the new titles of federal agencies and officers providing immigration, customs and border patrol duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.262 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.580 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3652A |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.157 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.157 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | print number 8331a |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-12-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03652 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8331A