NY A08295 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a university coordinator for veterans' services and requires coordination by the office of veteran's affairs and the state university regarding services to veterans.
Title
Establishes a university coordinator for veterans' services and requires coordination by the office of veteran's affairs and the state university regarding services to veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Asm. Ro Ann Destito [D] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to veterans' affairs | |
2009-05-26 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-13 | referred to veterans' affairs |