NY A08289 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To allow individuals Practicing interior design for fifteen years or more to be exempted from certain certification requirements.
Title
Allows special provisions for certain interior designers who have been practicing interior design for fifteen or more years prior to the effective date of this act to apply for certain exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-05-24 | print number 8289a | |
2010-05-24 | amend (t) and recommit to higher education | |
2010-01-06 | referred to higher education | |
2009-05-13 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S5571 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - referred to ways and means