NY A08277 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the terms "person", "human", and "human being" to mean a member of the species homo sapiens at any stage of biological development beginning at the moment of fertilization regardless of age, health, level of functioning, or condition of dependency; requires the right to life of all human beings.
Title
Defines the terms "person", "human", and "human being" to mean a member of the species homo sapiens at any stage of biological development beginning at the moment of fertilization regardless of age, health, level of functioning, or condition of dependency; requires the right to life of all human beings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-11-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-09-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-08-25 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |