NY A08276 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage scup.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage scup.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.222 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2128 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5710 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.199 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.199 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05710 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8276