NY A08275 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s660a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s660a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of native pollinator friendly plant species in medians along the highways of the state.
Title
Relates to the use of native pollinator friendly plant species in medians along the highways of the state.
Sponsors
Asm. Anna Kelles [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s660a |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.459 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 8275a |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-08-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00660 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.763